+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 8, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0821)
On March 29, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 821 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB86ER)
On February 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 1-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 1-N)
On February 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Criminal Law
On January 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 1999 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (88-Y 9-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 9-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 22, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 982555202-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Mr. Deeds agreed to
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 20, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 19, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 18, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 15, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 14, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On December 22, 1998 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 982555202
On November 23, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (16-Y 7-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Continued to 1999 in Courts of Justice (24-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1 (BAIL STUDY)
On January 14, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/98 982555202