+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Continued to 1995 in Transportation (9-Y 5-N 1-A)
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 2-N)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 2-N)
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed LD7076388 (HB857E)
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with amemdment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 3
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Reported from R. & I. N. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 9, 1994: Continued to 1995 in Transportation (9-Y 5-N 1-A)
February 12, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 2-N)
February 9, 1994: Reported from C. C. T. with amemdment (22-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1994: Reported from R. & I. N. (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor