+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 28, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0747)
On April 8, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 747 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 14, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB856ER)
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 3-N)
On February 4, 2000 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 009218828-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 009218828-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 009218828-H1
- Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/sub (20-Y 1-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 000970828
+ − Votes (5)
March 2, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2000: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
February 2, 2000: Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/sub (20-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor