+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N)
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (75-Y 24-N)
- Read third time and passed House (75-Y 24-N)
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB854H1
- Pending question ordered
- Committee substitute agreed to 10104769D-H1
- Read second time
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10104769D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 5-N)
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N)
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103485D
+ − Votes (4)
March 3, 2010: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N)
February 16, 2010: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (75-Y 24-N)
February 10, 2010: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 5-N)
February 3, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor