+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0211)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 211 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB852ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101329D
+ − Votes (7)
February 22, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2018: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2018: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor