+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (55)
On May 26, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0899)
On May 20, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 899 (effective 7/1/98)
On May 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On May 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On May 4, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled
On April 23, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB851ER)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House concurred in following Gov's recom. (99-Y 0-N)
- Recommendations agreed to # 1,2,3,5,6,8,9,10,11 & 12
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- House rejected Gov's recommendations # 4 & 7 (2-Y 96-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (2-Y 96-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in following Gov's recom. (38-Y 0-N)
- Recommendations agreed to #1,2,3,5,6,8,9,10,11 & 12
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (38-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Governor
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB851ER)
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 981603204-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 981603204-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 981603204-S1
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Engrossment reconsidered by House
- Amendments by Mr. Diamonstein agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- Printed as engrossed 989692204-EH1
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 989692204-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989692204-H1
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 989692204-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (29-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds. (26-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 6
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 982203204
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (38-Y 0-N)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (2-Y 96-N)
March 3, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: Reported from General Laws with sub. (15-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (29-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1998: Reported from General Laws with amds. (26-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor