+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0508)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 508 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/9/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB851ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB851H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16104374D-H1
- Read second time
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 16104374D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100976D
+ − Votes (7)
March 3, 2016: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2016: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2016: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2016: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor