+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 6, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 663 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB851ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 8-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (89-Y 8-N)
- Amended by conference committee
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: LeMunyon, Bell, R.B., Keam
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senators: Deeds, Puller, Wexton
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 91-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 14104971D-S1 (3-Y 91-N)
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104971D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB851S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14104971D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 14-N)
- Read third time and passed House (86-Y 14-N)
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended HB851E
- Printed as engrossed 14101977D-E
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (17-Y 3-N)
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 1-N)
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101977D