+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 7, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0201)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 201 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB848ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (92-Y 3-N)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 3-N)
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Pending question ordered
- Read second time
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102570D
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 2010: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2010: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2010: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (92-Y 3-N)
January 26, 2010: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor