+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (80)
On May 15, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0855)
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB848ER)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recom. (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 855 (effective-see bill)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB848ER)
On March 16, 1998 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 989789410-H2
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (SECOND) (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments rejected by conference committee
- Sub. recommended by conference comm. 989789410
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (SECOND) (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (FIRST) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Second conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Puller, Stump, Parrish
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (FIRST) (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (38-Y 0-N)
- Second conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Gartlan, Stosch, Wampler, Howell
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 985454410-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 985454410-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House (34-Y 58-N)
- House acceded to request
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST R (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Cranwell, Parrish, DeBoer, Rust
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Gartlan, Stosch, Wampler, Howell
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (34-Y 58-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 985454410-S1
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Read third time and passed House (74-Y 23-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 23-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 989656410-H1
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Amendment by Mr. McClure rejected (40-Y 55-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (40-Y 55-N)
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989656410-H1 (86-Y 11-N)
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (86-Y 11-N)
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with sub. (21-Y 2-N)
- Committee substitute printed 989656410-H1
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 985971410
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (15)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (40-Y 0-N)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (38-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (34-Y 58-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST R (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 23-N)
February 19, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (40-Y 55-N)
February 19, 1998: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (86-Y 11-N)
February 17, 1998: Reported from Finance with sub. (21-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor