+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 28, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0290)
On March 20, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 290 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB845ER)
On February 23, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 960039202-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/amds. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 960039202
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 20, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1996: Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1996: Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/amds. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor