+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On May 7, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0752)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 752 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB845ER)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (89-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 1-N)
- Amended by conference committee
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (38-Y 0-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST R (38-Y 0-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute rejected by House (18-Y 79-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (18-Y 79-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Delegates: Reid, Hull, Marshall
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Hanger, Watkins, Reynolds
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 980418424-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 980418424-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 980418424-S1
- Reported from Local Government w/sub. (8-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 986468424-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 986468424-H1
- VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 986468424-H1
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 1
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed 986380424
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (38-Y 0-N)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 1-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST R (38-Y 0-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (18-Y 79-N)
March 11, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: Reported from Local Government w/sub. (8-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: Reported from C. C. T. with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor