+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On December 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Left in Transportation
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 in Transportation (13-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed to LIS only 20109367D-S1
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (87-Y 11-N)
- Read third time and passed House (87-Y 11-N)
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB845H2
- Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 20107912D-H2
- Committee on Public Safety substitute rejected 20105880D-H1
- Read second time
On February 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 20107912D-H2
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 20105880D-H1
- Reported from Public Safety with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N)
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PS sub: Public Safety
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Public Safety
- Referred from General Laws by voice vote
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101768D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 27, 2020: Continued to 2021 in Transportation (13-Y 1-N)
February 11, 2020: VOTE: Passage (87-Y 11-N)
February 7, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2020: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2020: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
January 23, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Paul E. Krizek
Type:
Primary Sponsor