+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0285)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 285 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 11, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/4/16
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB844ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16104053D
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 2016: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2016: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2016: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor