+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Finance (20-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103943D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (2)
February 7, 2022: Reported from Finance (20-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor