+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 5, 2000 in the Senate:
- Left in Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to S. Rule20(j),rereferred by G.L. (15-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
On February 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 14-N)
- Read third time and passed House (85-Y 14-N)
On February 9, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 004983704-E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
On February 8, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds (21-Y 2-N)
On January 27, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 5
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 004983704
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 5, 2000: Left in Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2000: Pursuant to S. Rule20(j),rereferred by G.L. (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 14-N)
February 7, 2000: Reported from General Laws with amds (21-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor