+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 8, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0721)
On April 6, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 721 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 9, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB839ER)
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 27, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2002 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from General Laws (14-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 025953956-E
On February 6, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds (25-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 025953956
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
March 4, 2002: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2002: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2002: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2002: Reported from Appropriations with amds (25-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2002: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor