+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 29, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127)
On March 28, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 127 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 24, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB838ER)
On February 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 5-N)
- Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (12-Y 1-N 2-A)
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from R. & I. N. (21-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to R. & I. N. sub-committee: 3
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 5-N)
February 18, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1994: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 1-N 2-A)
February 8, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1994: Reported from R. & I. N. (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor