+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends no action by voice vote
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (16-Y 6-N)
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #3
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103726D
+ − Votes (2)
February 9, 2010: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (16-Y 6-N)
February 8, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor