+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (79)
On May 15, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0853)
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB837ER)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 853 (effective-see bill)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (96-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB837ER)
On March 16, 1998 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 988489146-H2
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (82-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 5-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by conference committee
- Sub. recommended by conference comm. 988489146
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (31-Y 1-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 1-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House (9-Y 90-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (9-Y 90-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Hawkins, Woods, Reynolds
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Cantor, Armstrong, Katzen
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- General Laws com. sub. reconsidered (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- General Laws committee sub. rejected
- Courts of Justice committee sub. agd. to 988793146-S2
- Reading of substitute waived
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 988793146-S2
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute printed 988793146-S2
On March 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (11-Y 1-N 2-A)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Civil & Property Law
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Passed by motion rejected
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute agreed to 987624757-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 987624757-S1
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 981588180-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 981588180-H1
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (26-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 981588180-H1
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 6
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Reported from Courts of Justice (23-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 989116146