+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2017 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB835H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16105153D-H1
- Read second time
On February 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 16105153D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103148D
+ − Votes (4)
February 19, 2016: Continued to 2017 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2016: Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor