+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0815)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 815 (effective 7/1/18)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB83ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB83ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106353D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB83H1
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106353D-H1
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2
On December 7, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101461D
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
+ − Votes (12)
April 18, 2018: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
April 18, 2018: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
April 18, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2018: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor