+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 8, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0642)
On April 6, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 642 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 12, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB829ER)
On February 26, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. (14-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 022513868
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2002: Reported from R. & S. S. (14-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2002: Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor