+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 19, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0790)
On April 11, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 790 (effective 7/1/94)
On April 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 1, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 25, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB828ER)
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD4396733 (HB828S1)
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed LD5703168 (HB828E)
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education (20-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 1
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
March 8, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1994: Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1994: Reported from Education (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor