+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 4, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0425)
On April 2, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 425 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2002 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB827ER)
On February 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Science and Technology (20-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 020322218
+ − Votes (5)
February 18, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2002: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2002: Reported from Science and Technology (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor