+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0187)
On March 19, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 187 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB825ER)
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (36-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (14-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 042771108-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB825E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amd (22-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 1
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 042771108