+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 16, 1997 in the House:
- Stricken from House calendar
On January 15, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 14, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 13, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 10, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 9, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On December 26, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 977781120-H1
On December 23, 1996 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 961757120
On December 19, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/sub. (20-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1996 in the House:
- Continued to 1997 in Cons. & Nat. Res. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 961757120