+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 31, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0118)
On March 23, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 118 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB822ER)
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 063455400
+ − Votes (5)
February 24, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2006: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2006: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor