+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 20, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0520)
On April 12, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 520 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB82ER)
On March 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Reading of amendment waived
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (36-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (12-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2004 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 046924372-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB82E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 20, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 19, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 1-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/16/03 046924372
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
February 25, 2004: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2004: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (36-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 19, 2004: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (12-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2004: Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor