+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 18, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0875)
On April 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
On April 17, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (100-Y 0-N)
On April 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 17, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB819ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 17, 2002 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 875 (effective 7/1/02)
On April 8, 2002 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB819ER)
On March 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2002 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 11, 2002 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 024886246-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 024886246-H1
- Read second time
On February 9, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 024886246-H1
On February 8, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2002 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 14, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 024452246
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
April 17, 2002: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
April 17, 2002: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2002: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2002: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2002: Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor