+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 12, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0300)
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 300 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB818ER)
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB818H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 049561296-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 049561296-H1
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from C. & L. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to C. & L. sub-committee: 2
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 040450296
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 8, 2004: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2004: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2004: Reported from C. & L. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2004: Reported from C. & L. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor