+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 6, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0677)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 677 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB817ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (83-Y 13-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (83-Y 13-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (27-Y 13-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendments (9-Y 5-N 1-A)
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (85-Y 13-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (85-Y 13-N 1-A)
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 20104624D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB817E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendment (19-Y 3-N)
On January 20, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned CT & I sub: Communications
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104624D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 26, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (83-Y 13-N)
February 24, 2020: Passed Senate with amendments (27-Y 13-N)
February 21, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2020: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (9-Y 5-N 1-A)
January 31, 2020: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 13-N 1-A)
January 20, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Patrick A. Hope
Type:
Primary Sponsor