+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 18, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0736)
On April 10, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 736 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 18, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB816ER)
On February 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD8112244 (HB816E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1994: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1994: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor