+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Referred from General Laws by voice vote
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104436D
+ − Votes (3)
February 9, 2018: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
January 30, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor