+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 21, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0479)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 479 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB815ER)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 987001376-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 987001376-H1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 987001376-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (29-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/sub. (21-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 986988376
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
+ − Votes (7)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 1998: Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (29-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1998: Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/sub. (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor