+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 18, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0095)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 95 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB813ER)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 980489376-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from L. & C. with amendment (24-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed 980489376
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1998: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 5, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1998: Reported from L. & C. with amendment (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor