+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 31, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0517)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 517 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2020
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB810ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (83-Y 16-N)
- Read third time and passed House (83-Y 16-N)
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N)
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104985D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 24, 2020: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2020: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2020: VOTE: Passage (83-Y 16-N)
January 21, 2020: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N)
January 16, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Jeffrey M. Bourne
Type:
Primary Sponsor