+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0024)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 24 (effective 7/1/10)
On February 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB810ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (33-Y 6-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (13-Y 2-N)
On February 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (90-Y 7-N)
- Read third time and passed House (90-Y 7-N)
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #2
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102854D
+ − Votes (6)
February 16, 2010: Passed Senate (33-Y 6-N)
February 15, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2010: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 2-N)
February 3, 2010: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (90-Y 7-N)
January 28, 2010: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor