+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (11-Y 4-N)
- Committee substitute printed to LIS only 18107230D-S1
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 24-N)
- Read third time and passed House (74-Y 24-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended HB809E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 18100665D-E
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendments (20-Y 2-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100665D
+ − Votes (4)
February 15, 2018: Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (11-Y 4-N)
February 2, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 24-N)
January 29, 2018: Reported from Education with amendments (20-Y 2-N)
January 24, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor