+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 15, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (27-Y 67-N)
- Read third time and defeated by House (27-Y 67-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Pending question ordered
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On February 13, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 4-N)
On January 25, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 2
On January 21, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 006923824
+ − Votes (2)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (27-Y 67-N)
February 13, 2000: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor