+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N)
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104789D
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
+ − Votes (2)
February 7, 2018: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N)
January 26, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor