+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (53)
On April 12, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0686)
On April 6, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 686 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 26, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 20, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB800ER)
On March 8, 1996 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 960077256-H3
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
- Sub. recommended by conference comm. 960077256-H3
- Senate substitute rejected by conference committee
On March 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (39-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
On March 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Delegates: Guest, Thomas, Brickley
On March 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Senators: Howell, Potts, Reasor
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (8-Y 89-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House (8-Y 89-N)
On March 1, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 29, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 960071256-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 960071256-S1
On February 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 960071256-S1
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 960061256-H2
- Committee substitute agreed to 960061256-H2
On February 8, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 960061256-H2
- Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1996 in the House:
- Rereferred to Conservation and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On January 31, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 960059256-H1
- Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/sub. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 960037815
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 8, 1996: VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (39-Y 0-N)
March 8, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1996: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (8-Y 89-N)
February 28, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1996: Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1996: Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1996: Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/sub. (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor