+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 17, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0471)
On April 5, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 471 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 15, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB80ER)
On March 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 2000 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 2000 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 000256948-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Del. Tata agreed to
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds (27-Y 1-N)
On February 3, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Motion to refer to committee agreed to
- Read first time
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Claims with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Claims sub-committee: 1
On January 12, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Claims
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/11/00 000256948
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 3, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2000: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
February 9, 2000: Reported from Appropriations with amds (27-Y 1-N)
February 2, 2000: Reported from Claims with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor