+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0441)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 441 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB799ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 18102734D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB799E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102734D