+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 8, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1047)
On April 24, 2000 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB795ER2)
On April 19, 2000 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 1047 (effective 7/1/00)
On April 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (36-Y 2-N)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 19, 2000 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (92-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 5-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On April 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV.'S RECOMM. (36-Y 2-N)
On April 19, 2000 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 10, 2000 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 13, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB795ER)
On February 25, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (52-Y 43-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (52-Y 43-N)
On February 24, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2000 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (82-Y 17-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 17-N 1-A)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 008189968-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 1, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amd (23-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 3
On January 21, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 008189968
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (8)
April 19, 2000: VOTE: ADOPT GOV.'S RECOMM. (36-Y 2-N)
April 19, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 5-N)
February 25, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (52-Y 43-N)
February 22, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2000: Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendments (15-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 17-N 1-A)
January 31, 2000: Reported from General Laws with amd (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor