+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 4, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0421)
On April 2, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 421 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB794ER)
On March 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2002 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 022297646-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 24, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 022297646