+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 776 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB793ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Taken up out of order pursuant to House Rule 52 (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107422D-S1 (97-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107422D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB793S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107422D-S1
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (93-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 6-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106474D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB793H1
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (17-Y 5-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106474D-H1
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104186D
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
+ − Votes (8)
February 28, 2018: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N)
February 26, 2018: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2018: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 6-N)
February 1, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor