+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 5, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0162)
On April 1, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 162 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB793ER)
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD7158208 (HB793E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Title replaced
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed