+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 7, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0839)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 839 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2020
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB791ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (83-Y 14-N)
- Read third time and passed House (83-Y 14-N)
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 20105027D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB791E
- Emergency clause deleted
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (21-Y 1-N)
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Health
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 20105027D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 24, 2020: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2020: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2020: VOTE: Passage (83-Y 14-N)
January 28, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Kenneth R. Plum
Type:
Primary Sponsor