+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Motion to refer to committee agreed to
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105704D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB79H1
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18105704D-H1
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned ACNRsub: Subcommittee #1
On December 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100596D
+ − Votes (3)
February 7, 2018: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2018: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
January 22, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor